Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7070173 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2006 | B2 | US2005236722 | 27.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39503002 | 11.07.2002 | US95586904 | 30.09.2004 | US17103705 | 30.06.2005 | US34164803 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005040547 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39503002 | 11.07.2002 | US95586904 | 30.09.2004 | US34164803 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006105127 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US95586904 | 30.09.2004 | US17103705 | 30.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006105119 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US95586904 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004007788 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39503002 | 11.07.2002 | US34164803 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004044584 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US39503002 | 11.07.2002 | US34164803 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1380747 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39503002 | 11.07.2002 | US34164803 | 14.01.2003 |