EP1380747 - Carburetor air-fuel mixture adjustment assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walbro Engine Management, L.L.C. Suite 310, 7400 N. Oracle Road Tucson, AZ 85704 / US | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vimercati, Giovanni Via Marconi, 14 Verano Brianza (MI) / IT | 02 /
Dow, Paul J. 6259 Seeger Cass City, MI 48726 / US | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/03] | 01 /
Vimercati, Giovanni Via Marconi, 14 Verano Brianza (MI) / IT | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/03] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg, Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012085.1 | 28.05.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | US20020395030P | 11.07.2002 Original published format: US 395030 P | US20030341648 | 14.01.2003 Original published format: US 341648 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380747 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Classification | IPC: | F02M3/10, F02M19/04 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
F02M19/04 (EP,US);
F02M3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennstoff-Luft-Mischjustiervorrichtung für einen Vergaser | [2004/03] | English: | Carburetor air-fuel mixture adjustment assembly | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif d'ajustement de mélange d'air-carburant d'un carburateur | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH09158783 |