EP1383293 - Connection information management system for managing connection information used in communications between IC cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Sakamura, Ken 4-9-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koshizuka, Noboru 2-27-20, Nishikubo Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-0013 / JP | |||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamura, Ken 9-2, Osaki 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Koshizuka, Noboru 27-20, Nishikubo 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Kazuhiko, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Mori, Kensaku, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Aono, Hiroshi, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Hongo, Sadayuki, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012239.4 | 10.06.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | JP20020169116 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002169116 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383293 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1383293 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383293 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G07F7/10, H04L29/12 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
G06Q20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vermittlungsinformationsverwaltung von im Datenverkehr zwischen IC-Karten verwendeten Verbindungsinformationen | [2004/04] | English: | Connection information management system for managing connection information used in communications between IC cards | [2004/04] | French: | Système de gestion d'information de connection pour gérer l'information de connection utilisé dans la communication entre cartes à puces | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9857474 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-10 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 10 ** page 16, line 18 - page 18, line 25 *; | [X]WO0160026 (BULL CP8 [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-10 * * page 2, line 22 - page 5, line 9 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 17 * * page 20, lines 20-27 * * page 25, line 22 - page 29, line 8 * * page 31, line 1 - page 35, line 6 * |