EP1366843 - Device for drilling inclined holes in pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plaggenborg, Bernd Ziegeleiweg 6 26169 Friesoythe / DE | For all designated states Köppen, Lothar Osterende 32 26655 Westerstede / DE | [2003/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012483.8 | 02.06.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | DE2002208512U | 31.05.2002 Original published format: DE 20208512 U | [2003/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1366843 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1366843 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23B41/00, B23C3/00 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
B23B41/00 (EP);
B23B2215/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/42] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Schräglochbohrungen in Rohren | [2003/49] | English: | Device for drilling inclined holes in pipes | [2003/49] | French: | Dispositif pour forer des trous obliques dans les tuyaux | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/20] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2004/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB832674 (BLACKBURN GROUP LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 1, line 22 - line 33 * * page 1, line 59 - line 62 * * page 2, line 47 - line 52 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP0845317 (PEDDINGHAUS ANLAGEN & MASCHINE [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 5, line 9 - line 25 ** figure 1 * |