EP1382430 - Control system for a compact equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battenfeld Extrusionstechnik GmbH Königstrasse 53 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Battenfeld Extrusionstechnik GmbH Königstrasse 53 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopp, Martin Opalweg 1 32425 Minden / DE | [2004/04] | Application number, filing date | 03012876.3 | 06.06.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | DE2002133136 | 20.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233136 | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382430 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/92 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C2948/92609 (EP);
B29C2948/92638 (EP);
B29C2948/92933 (EP);
B29C48/0022 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | Steuerung für eine Kompaktanlage | [2004/04] | English: | Control system for a compact equipment | [2004/04] | French: | Contrôle pour une installation compacte | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2130763 (BETA INSTR CO) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 49; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4698196 (FABIAN ELLIS [CA]) [Y] 1-9 * column 15, line 14 - column 15, line 22 *; | [Y]US5197633 (HINES GORDON E [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 6, line 2 - column 6, line 42 *; | [A]US5842013 (KOPP MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0918211 (BIERBAUMER HANS PETER DR H C [AT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0224434 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-9; | [PX]US2003050717 (HIRATA HAJIME [JP], et al) [PX] 1-9* paragraph [0261] - paragraph [0268] * |