EP1369887 - Multi-directional operation switch and multi-directional input device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Hiroto 4-7-11, Matsuigaoka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0353 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Hiroyasu 18-21, Kinshodai Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0135 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Masaki 3-4-1-911, Furuedai Suita-shi, Hyogo 666-0135 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Tamotsu 12-15-404, Yamate-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo 659-0096 / JP | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012923.3 | 06.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | JP20020165803 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002165803 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369887 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369887 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369887 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H25/04 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H01H13/807 (EP,US);
H01H13/785 (EP,US);
H01H25/041 (EP,US);
H04N21/42213 (EP,US);
H01H2025/048 (EP,US);
H01H2201/032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI [2006/07] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multidirektionale Schaltvorrichtung und multidirektionale Betätigungsvorrichtung, welche diese verwendet | [2011/37] | English: | Multi-directional operation switch and multi-directional input device using the same | [2003/50] | French: | Dispositif de commutation multidirectionel et dispositif de commande multidirectionel utillisant ce dispositif | [2003/50] |
Former [2003/50] | Multidirektionale Schaltvorrichtung und Multidirektionale Betätigungsvorrichtung welche diese verwendet | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.02.2012 | [2012/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5828363 (YANIGER STUART I [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]WO0213219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]WO0229837 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2002050919 (VANCE SCOTT LADELL [US]) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * page 7, column R, paragraph 4 - page 8, column L, paragraph 4 *; | [AP]US2003057062 (INOUE HIROTO [JP], et al) [AP] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2003085793 (INOUE HIROTO [JP], et al) [AP] 1,15* the whole document * | by applicant | WO0229837 |