EP1376388 - Method and system for encoding a mark-up language document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liao, Hongbin 54/F Beijing Sigma Center, No. 49, Zhichun Road Haidian District, Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
Zhang, Qian The Coal Office of Hubei Province, Fujiapo Road Wuhan, Hubei 430070 / CN | 03 /
Zhu, Wenwu 11 Queenberry Way Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012925.8 | 06.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020177830 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: US 177830 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376388 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376388 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H03M7/30 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Kodierung eines Markierungssprachedokumentes | [2004/01] | English: | Method and system for encoding a mark-up language document | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé et système de codage d'un document en langage de balisage | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SUNDARESAN N ET AL, "Algorithms and programming models for efficient representation of XML for Internet applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TENTH INTERNATIONAL WORLD WIDE WEB CONFERENCE, Hong Kong, (20010501), ISSN 1389-1286, pages 366 - 375, XP002433509 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/371920.372090 | [X] - LEVENE M ET AL, "XML STRUCTURE COMPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON WEB DYNAMICS, Honolulu, Hawaii, US, (20020507), pages 1 - 14, XP009048149 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * | [X] - GIRARDOT M ET AL, "MILLAU: AN ENCODING FORMAT FOR EFFICIENT REPRESENTATION AND EXCHANGE OF XML OVER THE WEB", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200006), vol. 33, no. 1-6, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 747 - 765, XP001005949 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * | [A] - LIEFKE H ET AL, "XMILL: AN EFFICIENT COMPRESSOR FOR XML DATA", SIGMOD RECORD, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0163-5808, pages 153 - 164, XP001002286 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/335191.335405 |