EP1375056 - Hydraulical tensioner and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AS Tech Industrie- und Spannhydraulik GmbH An Fürthenrode 52 52511 Geilenkirchen / DE | [2006/31] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states AS Tech Industrie- und Spannhydraulik GmbH An Fürthenrode 52 52511 Geilenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlösser, Arndt Cäcilienweg 23 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstrasse 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Kohlmann, Kai, Dipl.-Ing. Donatusstrasse 1 52078 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012997.7 | 10.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002126961 | 17.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10226961 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375056 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375056 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/06, B25B13/06, B25B23/14, B25B29/02 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B23P19/067 (EP);
B25B29/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Spannvorrichtung und deren Verwendung | [2004/01] | English: | Hydraulical tensioner and its use | [2004/01] | French: | Tendeur hydraulique et utilisation de ce dernier | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | RO | 02.08.2006 | SI | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | HU | 03.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2208280 (R.K.S.-PASQUIER, AVALLON, YONNE) [AD] 1,7-9,19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3047705 (HOHMANN HANS [DE]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 24 * * figures 2,3 *; | [XY]GB2236824 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,18,19 * page 6, line 13 - page 11, line 1; figures 1,2 * * abstract * [Y] 6,14,15; | [AD]DE4238922 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [AD] 1,7,8,11,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9533597 (HEDLEY PURVIS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 14,15 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 20; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19629352 (GAUPP ANTON [DE]) [A] 10* the whole document *; | [Y]US5871205 (LATHAM ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 4; figures 2,6,7 * * column A * |