Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322883 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2008 | B2 | US2004063482 | 01.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3842697B | Global Dossier | 08.11.2006 | B2 | JP2004008706 | 15.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003204623 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1371402 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2008 | B1 | EP1371402 | 17.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE388745T | 15.03.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60319628D1 | 24.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200304552 | 11.12.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2002170578 | 11.06.2002 |