EP1371402 - Game machine, server, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aruze Co., Ltd. 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | [2008/11] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Aruze Co., Ltd. 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoda, Hirobumi, c/o Aruze Co., Ltd. 1-25 Ariake 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Urner, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013078.5 | 10.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | JP20020170578 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002170578 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371402 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371402 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G07F17/3211 (EP,US);
A63F13/005 (EP);
A63F13/08 (EP);
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/26 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F13/35 (US);
A63F13/80 (EP);
A63F13/90 (EP);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3293 (EP,US);
A63F2300/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/37] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung, Server und Programm | [2003/51] | English: | Game machine, server, and program | [2003/51] | French: | Machine à jeu, serveur et logiciel | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 18.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | DE | 13.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | [2009/30] |
Former [2009/12] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
DE | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002010023 (KUSUDA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [X]US6386973 (YOSELOFF MARK L [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 9, line 37 - line 40 * * column 9, line 55 - line 57 * |