EP1365396 - Display playback apparatus, disk changer device and disk magazine device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLARION Co., Ltd. 3-35-2, Hakusan, Bunkyo-ku Tokio / JP | [2006/02] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states CLARION Co., Ltd. 3-35-2, Hakusan, Bunkyo-ku Tokio / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Nobuhiro c/o Clarion Co., Ltd., 3-35-2, Hakusan Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Hideki c/o Clarion Co., Ltd., 3-35-2, Hakusan Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Fritsche, Rainer Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Fritsche, Rainer, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013268.2 | 21.01.1998 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | JP19970019550 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1955097 | JP19970080990 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8099097 | JP19970079514 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7951497 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365396 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365396 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04, G11B17/30 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G11B17/30 (EP);
G11B23/0323 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/48] | Title | German: | Plattenwiedergabegerät, Plattenwechslervorrichtung und Plattenmagazin | [2003/48] | English: | Display playback apparatus, disk changer device and disk magazine device | [2003/48] | French: | Appareil pour la reproduction de disque,dispositif changeur de disque et magasin de disque | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98100988.9 / EP0856842 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]EP0284445 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 11, line 38 - line 63; figure 9 * [X] 2; | [A]EP0355011 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 35 - line 58; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]EP0575665 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * figures 1,5,9 *; | [YA]WO9528342 (CYGNET SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 9, line 5 - line 14; figure 11 * * page 11, line 6 - line 11; figure 21 * [A] 2-4; | [A]US5481514 (YAMASAKI HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 3* column 12, line 44 - line 61 * |