EP1376753 - High efficiency directional coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Killen, William Dean 2508 Watkins Drive Melbourne, FL 32901 / US | 02 /
Pike, Randy T. 5574 Schefflera Place Grant, FL 32949 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013316.9 | 12.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020185480 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 185480 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376753 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376753 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/18 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H01P5/185 (EP,US);
H01P5/184 (EP,US);
H05K1/024 (EP,US);
H05K1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Hocheffizienzer Richtungskoppler | [2004/01] | English: | High efficiency directional coupler | [2004/01] | French: | Coupleur directionnel à haute efficacité | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | BE | 27.09.2006 | CH | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | IE | 12.06.2007 | LU | 12.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.06.2007 | ||
LU | 12.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10190321 ; | [X]JPH08307117 ; | [X]US3581243 (ALFORD ANDREW) [X] 1,3-6* column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]US4967171 (BAN KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 3, lines 20-34; figures 4A,B *; | [Y]WO0101453 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 2,7 * page 10, lines 8-22; claims 4,5 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10190321 A 19980721 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * [Y] 2,7 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08307117 A 19961122 (TAISE:KK) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * abstract * | Examination | JP2000307362 | US5714112 | EP1108533 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000307362 A 20001102 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | - URL: http://www.mtt.org/publications/Transactions/CFP_Metamaterials.pdf | - KIZILTAS G. ET AL, "Metamaterial design via the density method", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM 2002, PISCATAWAY, (20020616), vol. 1, pages 748 - 751 |