EP1388633 - Device for detecting the aera surrounding a vehicle and device to open doors of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziller, Thomas Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 26 74354 Besigheim / DE | 02 /
Gotzig, Heinrich, Dr. Sommerau 28/2 74081 Heilbronn / DE | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/07] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013431.6 | 23.06.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | DE2002135925 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235925 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388633 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
E05F15/43 (EP);
E05F2015/483 (EP);
E05Y2900/546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/45] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugumfeldüberwachungssystem und automatische Fahrzeugtüröffnungseinrichtung | [2004/07] | English: | Device for detecting the aera surrounding a vehicle and device to open doors of a vehicle | [2004/07] | French: | Système pour la détection de le péripherie d'un véhicule et dispositif automatique pour ouvrir une porte d'un véhicule | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19829731 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-29 * * column 1, lines 41-51 * * column 1, lines 63-67 * * column 2, lines 10-16 * * column 4, lines 1-11 * * column 4, lines 36-63 *; | [X]DE19959990 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 40-46 * * column 2, lines 12-15 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 14 *; | [PX]DE10132886 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * |