EP1376306 - Multiplexing a secure counter to implement second level secure counters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
England, Paul 16659 Northup Way Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | 02 /
Peinado, Marcus 7, 168th Avenue NE. Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03013563.6 | 13.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020185506 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 185506 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376306 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376306 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Multiplexierung von einem sicheren Zähler zur Bereitstellung von sicheren Zählern auf zweiter Stufe | [2004/01] | English: | Multiplexing a secure counter to implement second level secure counters | [2004/01] | French: | Multiplexage d'un compteur sécurisé pour mettre en oeuvre des compteurs sécurisés de second niveau | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/36] | Appeal following examination | 29.05.2007 | Appeal received No. T1675/07 | 30.07.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5386369 (CHRISTIANO MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 3 - line 10 *; | [A]EP0679977 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 16 *; | [A]DE19821696 (PAGEL ERNST OLAV [DE]) [A] 1-29* column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO0004727 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-29 * page 7, paragraphs 1-3 *; | [X]WO0169352 (RAMIREZ OLGUIN NELSON ERIC [NO]) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US2002019813 (FURUYA YOJI [JP]) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021] * |