EP1387148 - Method for operating an inductive flow measuring arrangement,as well as flow measuring arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herwig, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. An der Reitbahn 8 37139 / DE | 02 /
Keese, Dieter Rodebach 6 37194 Wahlsburg / DE | 03 /
Schwiderski, Hans W., Dipl.-Ing. Obere Dorfstrasse 28 37176 Nörten-Hardenberg / DE | [2004/06] | Application number, filing date | 03013683.2 | 17.06.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | DE2002135354 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235354 | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387148 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1387148 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP);
G01F1/58 (EP);
G01F1/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/09] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer induktiven Durchflussmesseinrichtung,sowie Durchflussmesseinrichtung selbst | [2004/06] | English: | Method for operating an inductive flow measuring arrangement,as well as flow measuring arrangement | [2004/06] | French: | Procédé d' opération d' un système de mesure du débit, ainsi que système de mesure du débit | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 21.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/52] | 20.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4137766 (HANDEL NEIL E) [A] 4,9 * column 6, lines 26-45 * * column 7, lines 3-23 ** figures 1-7 *; | [X]JPH02103418 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * abstract *; | [X]EP0626567 (ULTRAKUST ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 3, lines 45-49 * * column 4, lines 11-46 * * column 6, lines 16-18 * * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0814971 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0961209 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract *; | [X]WO0246851 (FLOWTEC AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * the whole document * |