Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1489241 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1489241



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 51
08.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
05.08.2005 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
06.06.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.05.2005 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 4
29.04.2005 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
18.04.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 4
28.12.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.11.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.12.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.11.2003 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
13.08.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 1
20.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2003 Description Search / examination 10
20.06.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2003 Drawings Search / examination 2
20.06.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6