blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1489241

EP1489241 - Mounting system for ceiling elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.04.2006  [2006/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATD-Akustiktherm AG
Im Hölderli 26
8405 Winterthur / CH
[2005/29]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
Schneider Dämmtechnik AG
Im Hölderli 26
8405 Winterthur / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Ganz, Jochen
Im Bachofen 7
8610 Uster / CH
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
[2004/52]
Application number, filing date03013914.120.06.2003
[2004/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489241
Date:22.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:E04B9/24, E04B9/06, E04F13/08, F24F5/00, F24D3/16
[2004/52]
CPC:
E04B9/064 (EP); E04B9/006 (EP); E04B9/248 (EP);
E04F13/0883 (EP); F24D19/009 (EP); F24F5/0089 (EP);
F24F5/0092 (EP); H02G3/281 (EP); H02G3/381 (EP);
E04B2001/8281 (EP); E04B2001/8442 (EP); E04B2001/8461 (EP);
F24D3/16 (EP); F24D3/165 (EP); Y02B30/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/37]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zum Befestigen von Deckenelementen[2004/52]
English:Mounting system for ceiling elements[2004/52]
French:Système de fixation pour éléments de plafonds[2004/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/16]
08.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.08.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
05.08.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.08.2005M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3292328  (LEWIS STANLEY T, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * column 2, line 65; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]NL6905984  (METAALWARENFABRIEK VAN GEEL N.V.) [Y] 7,8 * page 5, line 19 - line 28; figure 2 *;
 [XY]DE29516326U  (WILHELMI WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8;
 [X]EP0992425  (ABB AB [SE]) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,10 * paragraph [0019]; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]EP1167888  (SCHNEIDER DAEMMTECHNIK AG [CH]) [A] 7* figures 8A,8B *
by applicantEP1167888
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.