Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7131482 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2006 | B2 | US2004084172 | 06.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | US4869502 | 19.07.2002 | US69335103 | 24.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3826229B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2006 | B2 | JP2003506217 | 18.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1591177 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2008 | B1 | EP1591177 | 02.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00953275 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | EP04020511 | 04.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1504834 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | B1 | EP1504834 | 09.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00953275 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1198314 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2005 | B1 | EP1198314 | 24.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU757704B | Global Dossier | 06.03.2003 | B2 | AU6579300 | 05.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1354652 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2004 | B1 | EP1354652 | 14.01.2004 | A3 | EP1354652 | 22.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP00953275 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE313403T | 15.01.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0013027 | 16.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2378352 | 14.03.2006 | C | CA2378352 | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2479558 | 12.06.2007 | C | CA2479558 | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2378352 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2479561 | 12.06.2007 | C | CA2479561 | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2378352 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2479565 | 23.12.2008 | C | CA2479565 | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2378352 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60024998T | 14.09.2006 | T2 | DE60024998D1 | 26.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1354652T | 11.04.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1591177T | 19.01.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS6243 | 22.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20020484L | 30.01.2002 | L | NO20020484D0 | 30.01.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7036555 | 02.05.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB0002951 | 04.08.2000 | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0110584 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE284287T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE307695T | 15.11.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE409535T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60016637T | 22.12.2005 | T2 | DE60016637D1 | 13.01.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60023572T | 27.07.2006 | T2 | DE60023572D1 | 01.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60040421D1 | 13.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1198314T | 08.05.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1504834T | 19.12.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2352992 | 09.01.2002 | B | GB2352992 | 14.02.2001 | A | GB9918350D0 | 06.10.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2220817 | 10.01.2004 | C2 | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200200255 | 25.09.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9918350 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Earlier application | EP1198314 |