EP1378529 - Process for producing TDI-trimers having a low monomer content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brahm, Martin, Dr. Küchenberger Strasse 67 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Simon, Joachim, Dr. Am Broichgraben 62d 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Wilmes, Oswald, Dr. Edmund-ter-Meer-Strasse 28 51061 Köln / DE | 04 /
Walloschek, Jürgen, Dr. Bogenstrasse 16 53819 Neunkirchen / DE | [2004/02] | Application number, filing date | 03013996.8 | 20.06.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | DE2002129780 | 03.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10229780 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378529 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378529 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/09, C08G18/79 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
C08G18/794 (EP,US);
C08G18/00 (KR);
C08G18/022 (EP,US);
C08G18/1841 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung monomerenarmer TDI-Trimerisate | [2004/02] | English: | Process for producing TDI-trimers having a low monomer content | [2004/02] | French: | Procédé de production de trimères de TDI à faible teneur en monomères | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.03.2006 | CZ | 29.03.2006 | EE | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | IE | 29.03.2006 | RO | 29.03.2006 | SI | 29.03.2006 | SK | 29.03.2006 | TR | 29.03.2006 | AT | 20.06.2006 | LU | 20.06.2006 | BG | 29.06.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | HU | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 20.06.2006 | ||
LU | 20.06.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 20.06.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 20.06.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 20.06.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
AT | 20.06.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 29.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2301585 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-6* page 5, line 1 - line 19; example 1 *; | [X]DE2551634 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,2,4 * * page 8, paragraph 3 *; | [DA]EP0416338 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * page 5, line 16 - line 38; examples 1,2 * |