EP1384633 - Locking system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states HUF HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GMBH & CO. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittwer, Reinhard Beuthener Strasse 26 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 02 /
Schindler, Mirko Bergische Strasse 33 42549 Velbert / DE | 03 /
Hansen-Rüther, Dirk Rüggeberger Strasse 93 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014137.8 | 24.06.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | DE2002133511 | 23.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233511 | [2004/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384633 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04, B60R25/02 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B60R25/02153 (EP,US);
B60R25/02 (KR);
B60R25/02142 (EP,US);
B60R25/0215 (KR);
B60R25/04 (EP,US);
B60R25/2063 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/43] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schliesssystem für Motorfahrzeuge | [2004/05] | English: | Locking system for a motor vehicle | [2004/05] | French: | Système de verrouillage pour véhicule à moteur | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19653860 (VALEO GMBH & CO SCHLIESSYST KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,16,18 * column 3, line 49 - line 58 * * column 4, line 13 - line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP0893315 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,17,18 * column 4, line 24 - line 25 * * column 5, line 26 - line 58 * * column 7, line 5 - line 26 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 55; figures 5A,5B * [Y] 9,17,20; | [Y]DE19836968 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 36 - line 46 *; | [Y]US2002023468 (FRICK ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 17 * page 1, paragraph 17 *; | [Y]DE10147031 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 20* column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 3 * | by applicant | EP0999968 |