EP1376562 - Information read/write medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togashi, Takahiro, c/o Sougoukenkyusho Pioneer Corporation, 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Masataka, c/o Sougoukenkyusho Pioneer Corporation, 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
Okumura, Yoichi, c/o Sougoukenkyusho Pioneer Corporation, 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken 350-2288 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014188.1 | 24.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP20020188831 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002188831 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376562 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376562 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/259 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationswiedergabe- / -Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2004/01] | English: | Information read/write medium | [2004/01] | French: | Support de reproduction / d'enregistrement d'informations | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0810590 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 13 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 19 - line 20 *; | [XA]WO9959143 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 19 - line 27 * * page 4, line 26 - line 28 * * page 4, line 12 - line 19 * [A] ; | [A]US6009070 (HIGUCHI TAKANOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0978831 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0057] *; | [X]EP1005036 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0020] , [0048] - [0050] - [0078] , [0080] , [0082] *; | [A]US6312780 (KASAMI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]EP1172811 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0057] , [0058] , [0067] , [0120] * |