EP1378932 - Semiconductor chip mounting apparatus and mounting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murayama, Kei c/o Shinko Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd., 711, Aza Shariden Oaza Kurita, Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0921 / JP | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Patentanwälte, Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014236.8 | 25.06.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | JP20020192170 | 01.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002192170 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1378932 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1378932 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378932 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/544 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L2223/54473 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75743 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81136 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/41] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparat zur Befestigung von Halbleiterchips und eine Methode zur Befestigung | [2004/02] | English: | Semiconductor chip mounting apparatus and mounting method | [2004/02] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de montage d'une puce semi-conducteur | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61259539 ; | [A]US4911543 (HODGSON R W [US]) [A] 1,7* figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870407), vol. 0111, no. 10, Database accession no. (E - 496), & JP61259539 A 19861117 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |