EP1357422 - Portable projection screen assembly with adjustable height [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Izumi-Cosmo Co., Ltd. 4-18, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Izumi-Cosmo Co., Ltd. 4-18, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamoto, Hideo, Izumi-Cosmo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Sub-Head Office, 4-20, Nihonbashi Hongokucho 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0021 / JP | 02 /
Omura, Tetsujiro, Izumi-Cosmo Co., Ltd. Tokyo Sub-Head Office, 4-20, Nihonbashi Hongokucho 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0021 / JP | 03 /
Seki, Kazuharu 14-2, Kamata 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-0077 / JP | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 03014247.5 | 18.08.1999 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980234542 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23454298 | JP19990006345 | 13.01.1999 Original published format: JP 634599 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357422 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357422 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357422 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/58 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
G03B21/58 (EP,US);
G03B21/56 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/44] | Title | German: | Transportabler Projektionsschirm mit einstellbarer Höhe | [2003/44] | English: | Portable projection screen assembly with adjustable height | [2003/44] | French: | Ecran de projection avec reglage de hauteur | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99116283.5 / EP0984321 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0534826 ; | [X]US1981444 (OTTO WITTEL) [X] 1 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 102; figure 1 *; | [X]DE611894 (ROBERT FORGIE HUNTER, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]GB456133 (MECHANISCHE WEBEREI G M B H) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2479812 (OSWALD CECHMANEK KARL) [X] 1* column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5706130 (ROSEN JOHN B [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 22; figures 1-4 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 29 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930617), vol. 017, no. 320, Database accession no. (P - 1558), & JP05034826 A 19930212 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |