EP1375059 - Device for storing and dispensing tools for machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demmeler, Johannes Vöhlinstrasse 2 87737 Boos / DE | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann 89296 Schloss Osterberg / DE | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 03014254.1 | 25.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002128651 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10228651 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375059 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1375059 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/155, B23Q3/157 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B23Q3/15526 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15722 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15724 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | B23Q3/155 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/37] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Bevorraten und Zurverfügungstellen von Maschinenwerkzeugen | [2004/01] | English: | Device for storing and dispensing tools for machines | [2004/01] | French: | Dispositif pour l'approvisionnement et pour la distribution d'outils | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4087901 (LOHNEIS EARL R, et al) [X] 1,3,4,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4119213 (SATO MITUHARU, et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,5 *; | [X]DE3501113 (GRUENER HORST) [X] 1,2* figure 2; claims 11-14 * |