EP1492371 - Method for accessing a frequency band of a radio communication system over another frequency band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dillinger, Markus Unterhachingerstrasse 89 81737 München / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Egon, Dr. Wittenberger Strasse 3 80993 München / DE | 03 /
Mohyeldin, Eiman Bushra Forstenrieder Allee 202 81476 München / DE | 04 /
Luo, Jijun Stuntzstrasse 35/4M 81677 München / DE | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 03014293.9 | 25.06.2003 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492371 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04W36/06 (EP);
H04W36/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zugriffsverfahren auf ein Frequenzband eines Funkkommunikationssystems über ein anderes Frequenzband | [2005/01] | English: | Method for accessing a frequency band of a radio communication system over another frequency band | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé pour l'accès à une bande de fréquence d'un système de radiocommunication via une autre bande de fréquence | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0016578 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,10,11* Zusammenfassung *; | [A]WO0131948 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,4,7,8,10,11 * Zusammenfassung * * page 3, line 21 - line 25 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 6 *; | [XY]WO0158189 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-11 * page 4, line 12 - line 26 * * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 6 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 26 * * page 14, line 2 - line 3 * * page 16, line 19 - line 28 * * page 17, line 8 - line 13 * [Y] 2; | [Y] - ALMGREN M ET AL, Channel allocation and power settings in a cellular system with macro and micro cells using the same frequency spectrum, VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1996. MOBILE TECHNOLOGY FOR THE HUMAN RACE., IEEE 46TH ATLANTA, GA, USA 28 APRIL-1 MAY 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 1150-1154, ISBN 0-7803-3157-5, XP010162570 [Y] 2 * page 1150, column L, line 3 - line 7 * * page 1150, column R, line 5 - line 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1996.501492 |