EP1354931 - Preparing a high viscosity index, low branch index dewaxed oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Stephen J 520 45th. Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2003/43] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03014566.8 | 29.01.1999 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | US19980077070P | 06.03.1998 Original published format: US 77070 P | US19980107835 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: US 107835 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354931 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1354931 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10G67/04, C10G45/64 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP);
C10G2400/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/43] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SCHMIERÖL MIT HOHEM VISKOSITÄTSINDEX UND NIEDRIGEM VERZWEIGUNGSINDEX | [2003/43] | English: | Preparing a high viscosity index, low branch index dewaxed oil | [2003/43] | French: | Préparation d' une huile lubrifiante à haut indice de viscosité et à bas indice de branchement. | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 24.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99904511.5 / EP1060231 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4919788 (CHEN NAI Y [US], et al) [X] 1-8,19-23,25,26 * claims 1-9 * [Y] 12-18,21,22; | [A]US5037528 (GARWOOD WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5282958 (SANTILLI DONALD S [US], et al) [Y] 12-18,21,22 * column 8, line 29 - line 32; claims 1-14 *; | [A]US5643440 (BORGHARD WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document * |