EP1492018 - Computer-implemented method and system for accessing, processing and outputting data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SAP AG Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feco, Richard Alter Postweg 69 69207 Sandhausen / DE | 02 /
Reiner, Robert, Dr. Im Krautgarten 24 69207 Sandhausen / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Schiuma, Daniele Wolfgang, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014741.7 | 27.06.2003 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492018 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06T11/20, G06F17/60 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Ein rechnerimplementiertes Verfahren und System zum Zugriff, Verarbeiten und Ausgeben von Daten | [2005/01] | English: | Computer-implemented method and system for accessing, processing and outputting data | [2005/01] | French: | Un procédé et système implémenté par ordinateur pour accéder, traiter et visualiser des données | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 21.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6320586 (PLATTNER HASSO [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 5 - line 41; figure 4 * * column 5, line 4 - line 42; figure 7 *; | [A]US2002174006 (RUGGE ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0096]; figures 16,17 *; | [A]WO03014974 (POLYVISTA INC [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0106]; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2003046195 (MAO WENBO [CN]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - "SAP iView Guidelines", INTERNET ARTICLE. SAP DESIGN GUILD., (20030502), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20030502104835/http://www.sapdesignguild.org/resources/ma_guidelines_3/ma_guidelines_3.pdf, (20040127), XP002268912 [X] 1-12 * page 25 - page 26 * * page 65 - page 68 * * page 83 - page 87 * * page 103 - page 106 * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "OLAP Reporting with Crystal Reports 9. OLAP and Analytics", INTERNET ARTICLE. CRYSTAL DECISIONS, INC, (20020930), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://support.crystaldecisions.com/communityCS/TechnicalPapers/cr9_olap.pdf, (20040203), XP002268913 [X] 1-12 * page 7 - page 12 * * page 14; figure 15 * | [X] - YODER JW, "A FrameWork for Building Financial Models", INTERNET ARTICLE. NCSA & CATERPILLAR, (1997), pages 1 - 53, URL: http://www.joeyoder.com/financial_framework/finmod.pdf, (20040129), XP002268914 [X] 1-12 * page 5 - page 18 * * page 38 - page 48 * | [A] - "GRAPHICS QUERY SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19870801), vol. 30, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 350 - 351, XP002015495 [A] 1-5,12 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "IBM WebSphere Applet Designer Guide", INTERNET ARTICLE. IBM WEBSPHERE STUDIO V3.5 DOCUMENTATION, (200008), pages 95 - 113, URL: http://www-306.ibm.com/software/webservers/studio/doc/v35/AppletDesignerGuide.pdf, (20040203), XP002268915 [A] 2-5 * Section: Gauge beans.; pages 95-97 * * page 106 - page 109 * |