EP1378701 - Quick-acting connection for joining two pipe ends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMS Chemie AG Reichenauerstrasse 7013 Domat/Ems / CH | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeltsch, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Barnaus 7013 Domat/Ems / CH | 02 /
Willi, Mario, Dipl.-Ing. ETH Gassa surô 25 7013 Domat/Ems / CH | 03 /
Kettl, Ralph, Dipl.-Ing. FH Versamerstrasse 7 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim Stapferstrasse 5 Postfach 2651 8033 Zürich / CH | [2009/29] |
Former [2004/02] | Lauer, Joachim, Dr. Postfach 2651 8033 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03014787.0 | 28.06.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | CH20020001168 | 03.07.2002 Original published format: CH 11682002 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378701 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378701 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/084 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
F16L37/084 (EP,US);
F16L37/08 (KR);
F16L37/0985 (EP);
Y10S285/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Schnellverbindung zum Verbinden von zwei Rohrenden | [2004/02] | English: | Quick-acting connection for joining two pipe ends | [2004/02] | French: | Raccord à action rapide pour l'assemblage de deux extrémités de tubes | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 05.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | IE | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | AT | 28.06.2007 | LU | 28.06.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 11.10.2006 | |
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
AT | 28.06.2007 | ||
LU | 28.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
AT | 28.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
AT | 28.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1007746 (REX ROBINSON ROSS) [A] 1* figure - *; | [AD]DE3727858 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [AD] 1-23 * figure - * | by applicant | DE3727858 | DE3843995 | WO9934143 | JPH11201356 | EP0750152 |