EP1382538 - Bag and process for filling it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhn, Uwe Heidkamp 17 49078 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Stienecker, Ulrich Im Mühlenkamp 26 49549 Ladbergen / DE | [2004/04] | Application number, filing date | 03014805.0 | 30.06.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | DE2002132107 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10232107 | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1382538 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1382538 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D30/20, B65D30/24 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
B65D31/10 (EP);
B65D31/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | Sack und Verfahren zum Befüllen desselben | [2004/04] | English: | Bag and process for filling it | [2004/04] | French: | Sac et procédé pour son remplissage | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/14] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2799314 (ANDRE DREYER, et al) [X] 1-7,9,15 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-4,9-14 *; | [X]GB875848 (METAL BOX CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9,15 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 28; figures 1-8 *; | [XY]DE1238758 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 16-23; | [X]EP0300094 (AL SHARHAN BADER A [KW], et al) [X] 1-6,15* column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]US5863131 (NAKAMURA TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,12-15 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-8 * [Y] 16-23; | [DY]DE19936660 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [DY] 16-23 * the whole document * |