EP1403103 - Adjustable suspension strut for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietz, Matthias Kirchgärten 18 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
Luger, Martin Flachter Strasse 23 71287 Weissach / DE | [2004/14] | Application number, filing date | 03014906.6 | 01.07.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE2002145362 | 28.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10245362 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1403103 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1403103 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403103 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/027 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
B60G17/0272 (EP);
B60G15/065 (EP);
F16F13/007 (EP);
F16F9/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Verstellbares Federbein für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2004/14] | English: | Adjustable suspension strut for motor vehicles | [2004/14] | French: | Jambe de suspension réglable pour véhicules automobiles | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 26.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2007 | CZ | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | EE | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | IE | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | RO | 22.08.2007 | SI | 22.08.2007 | SK | 22.08.2007 | TR | 22.08.2007 | BG | 22.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | HU | 23.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
HU | 23.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 22.08.2007 | |
BG | 22.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4530489 (HIRANO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5401053 (SAHM DIETRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]DE19529580 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19830922 (SCHREIBER JENS UWE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19529580 |