EP1355236 - Data transferring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Tadahiro 4-20-5-507, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Hiroyuki 5-5-1-98, Douu-chu Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0011 / JP | 03 /
Akamatsu, Hironori 1-32-30-504, Minamikuzuha Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1105 / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Satoshi 4-23-11, Nagao-Kagumachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0102 / JP | 05 /
Terada, Yukata 1-9-3-C-406, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | 06 /
Arima, Yukio 16-6-203, Suehiro-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0030 / JP | 07 /
Hirata, Takashi 2-27-11 Megaki Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0836 / JP | 08 /
Komatsu, Yoshihide 2-5-26 Higashikouri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0075 / JP | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
Yoshida, Tadahiro 4-20-5-507, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamauchi, Hiroyuki 5-5-1-98, Douu-chu Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
Akamatsu, Hironori 1-32-30-504, Minamikuzuha Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1105 / JP | |||
04 /
Takahashi, Satoshi 4-23-11, Nagao-Kagumachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0102 / JP | |||
05 /
Terada, Yukata 1-9-3-C-406, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | |||
06 /
Arima, Yukio 22-7-425, Kori-nishino-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0089 / JP | |||
07 /
Hirata, Takashi 22-7-428, Kori-nishino-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0089 / JP | |||
08 /
Komatsu, Yoshihide 1-16-22-223, Kikusuido Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03014943.9 | 05.10.1999 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | JP19980284907 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28490798 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355236 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1355236 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355236 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F13/38 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G06F13/4265 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | G06F13/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/43] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungsgerät | [2003/43] | English: | Data transferring device | [2003/43] | French: | Dispositif de transfert de donnees | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 07.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99119683.3 / EP0992914 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5485488 (VAN BRUNT ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 4 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5559967 (OPRESCU FLORIN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract ** column 2, line 60 - line 64 * |