EP1353406 - Antenna for mobile, in particular for a vehicle, with at least one circular and one linear polarisation, preferably vertical polarisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Kathrein Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolle, Manfred Rennbahnstrasse 9 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 02 /
Wurm, Michael Kirchgasse 5 83075 Dettendorf / DE | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015118.7 | 27.04.2000 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | DE1999124349 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19924349 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353406 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353406 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/28, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/30, H01Q19/28, H01Q1/32, H01Q1/50 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H01Q19/28 (EP);
H01Q1/3275 (EP);
H01Q21/28 (EP);
H01Q9/0407 (EP);
H01Q9/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/42] | Title | German: | Mobilantenne, insbesondere Fahrzeugantenne, für zumindest eine zirkulare und zumindest eine lineare, vorzugsweise vertikale Polarisation | [2003/42] | English: | Antenna for mobile, in particular for a vehicle, with at least one circular and one linear polarisation, preferably vertical polarisation | [2003/42] | French: | Antenne pour mobile en particulier pour véhicule comprenant au moins une polarisation circulaire et une polarisation linéaire, de préférence verticale | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00108957.2 / EP1056155 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/21] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0998018 ; | [A]US4030100 (PERROTTI EMMANUAL JOSEPH) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2571550 (TELEINFORMATIQUE COMMUNIC ET [FR]) [A] 1* figure . *; | [A]WO9725754 (ANTENEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 16; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09098018 A 19970408 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |