EP1378435 - Assisting apparatus for changing speeds in a bicycle transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tetsuka, Toshio 2090-4-605 Fukaishimizu-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kanehisa, Takanori 1-11-207 Miharadai Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tabe, Koshi 1-29-14-410 Harumidai Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Hino, Tetsuya 8-8 Ozukiminamimachi Shimonoseki-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 05 /
Watarai, Etuyoshi 1129-3 Uedai-cho Izumi-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Shahana, Satoshi 3-9-37 Asahi, Nishinari-ku Osaka / JP | [2009/42] |
Former [2004/02] | 01 /
Tetsuka, Toshio 2090-4-605 Fukaishimizu-cho Sakei-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Kanehisa, Takanori 1-11-207 Miharadai Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Tabe, Koshi 1-29-14-410 Harumidai Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Hino, Tetsuya 8-8 Ozukiminamimachi Shimonoseki-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | |||
05 /
Watarai, Etuyoshi 1129-3 Uedai-cho Izumi-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
06 /
Shahana, Satoshi 3-9-37 Asahi, Nishinari-ku Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015313.4 | 07.07.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | US20020190461 | 05.07.2002 Original published format: US 190461 | US20030372582 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 372582 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1378435 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1378435 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378435 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/12 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
B62M25/02 (EP,US);
B62M2025/006 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20043 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2042 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20474 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/50] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hilfsschaltvorrichtung in einer Fahrradgangschaltung | [2004/02] | English: | Assisting apparatus for changing speeds in a bicycle transmission | [2004/02] | French: | Dispositif d'assistance de changement de vitesse pour transmission de bicyclette | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 10.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03021240.1 / EP1394034 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0558425 (BG INNOVATION SARL [FR]) [A] 1-103 * abstract *; | [A]EP0834685 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1-103* abstract *; | [A]US6142899 (LIU CHENG-WEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-103 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP1106496 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,38,48,69 * the whole document * [A] 2-37,39-47,49-68,70-103 | by applicant | US5358451 | EP1106496 |