EP1403609 - Method for applying an inner coating to a gun barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 40880 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Rheinmetall W & M GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Stefan Neumarkt 2 29221 Celle / DE | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Dietrich, Barbara c/o Rheinmetall AG, Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015336.5 | 08.07.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE20021043314 | 18.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243314 | DE20031029131 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10329131 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403609 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F41A21/02, F41A21/22 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
F41A21/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres | [2004/14] | English: | Method for applying an inner coating to a gun barrel | [2004/14] | French: | Procédé pour le revêtement intérieur d'une tube d'arme | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3808285 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 6 *; | [A]DE19919688 (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 1 *; | [A]DE19919687 (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 33-56 * |