blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1388694

EP1388694 - Sealing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2006/02]
Former [2004/07]For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Steinert, Klaus-Albrecht
Uhlandstrasse 6
64668 Rimbach / DE
02 / Jäck, Thomas
Schulstrasse 48
64658 Fürth / DE
03 / Fading, Karl
Kiefernweg 4
69514 Laudenbach / DE
 [2004/07]
Application number, filing date03015408.209.07.2003
[2004/07]
Priority number, dateDE200213683110.08.2002         Original published format: DE 10236831
[2004/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1388694
Date:11.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1388694
Date:06.05.2004
[2004/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1388694
Date:11.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:F16J15/32, F16J15/00
[2004/19]
CPC:
F16J15/3228 (EP); F16J15/004 (EP)
Former IPC [2004/07]F16J15/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/04]
Former [2004/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dichtungsanordnung[2004/07]
English:Sealing arrangement[2004/07]
French:Dispositif d'étanchéité[2004/07]
Examination procedure18.07.2003Examination requested  [2004/07]
05.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2005Fee for grant paid
12.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
AT09.07.2006
[2007/50]
Former [2007/45]GB11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
Former [2007/39]GB11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
Former [2007/13]GB11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
Former [2006/46]SE11.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4053166  (DOMKOWSKI RONALD A) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 45 - line 53 * * column 3, line 5 - line 13 * * column 4, line 5 - line 13 * * column 4, line 47 - line 50 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 15 * [Y] 3,9,10,12;
 [Y]US5727794  (FAUCHON CLAUDE [IT], et al) [Y] 3,9,10,12 * figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 22 - line 24 * * column 2, line 53 - line 60 * * column 3, line 8 - line 16 * * column 3, line 26 - line 36 *;
 [A]WO0111275  (LUK FAHRZEUG HYDRAULIK [DE], et al) [A] 11* figure 1 *
by applicantDE3619309
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.