EP1499004 - Method for controlling a synchronous rectifier and synchronous rectifier controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Puls Elektronische Stromversorgungen GmbH Arabellastrasse 15 81925 Munich / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Puls Elektronische Stromversorgungs GmbH Arabellastrasse 15 81925 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdl, Bernhard Pienzenauerstr. 84 81925 München / DE | 02 /
Kroll, Peter Further Str. 14 09113 Chemnitz / DE | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015650.9 | 17.07.2003 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499004 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499004 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H02M3/33592 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/40] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Synchrongleichrichters und Steuersatz für einen Synchrongleichrichter | [2005/03] | English: | Method for controlling a synchronous rectifier and synchronous rectifier controller | [2005/03] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un redresseur synchrone et contrôleur pour un redresseur synchrone | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 20.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.09.2012 | [2013/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6021059 (KENNEDY DENNIS M [US]) [A] 1,2,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6069804 (INGMAN THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US2001026462 (TOKUNAGA NORIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]WO0239571 (NMB U S A INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * figure - *; | [AD] - LIBRIZZI F., SCALIA P., "STSRx FAMILY: MIXED SIGNAL ICs TO DRIVE SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIERS IN ISOLATED SMPSs", AN1288 APPLICATION NOTE - STMICROELECTRONICS, (200007), pages 1/20 - 20/20, XP002265900 [AD] 1-20 * page 1 * * pages 9-18 * |