EP1452116 - Fitting for fixing of swinging doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lämmerer & Co. Glasdesign GmbH Heininger Strasse 21 91550 Dinkelsbühl / DE | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lämmerer, Albert Heininger Strasse 21 91550 Dinkelsbühl / DE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Volpert, Marcus, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 4 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Volpert, Marcus, et al Zeitler, Volpert, Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Kern, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Kern, Volpert und Kollegen Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015701.0 | 09.07.2003 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | DE2003203059U | 25.02.2003 Original published format: DE 20303059 U | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1452116 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452116 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/36, E05D11/10, E05D5/02 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
E05D7/081 (EP);
A47K3/362 (EP);
E05D11/1014 (EP);
E05D5/0246 (EP);
A47K2003/367 (EP);
E05D11/1078 (EP);
E05D2005/106 (EP);
E05D2007/0461 (EP);
E05D2011/1092 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI [2005/20] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beschlag zur Befestigung von Schwenktüren | [2004/36] | English: | Fitting for fixing of swinging doors | [2004/36] | French: | Ferrure pour fixation de portes pivotantes | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 28.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2046108 (SAINT GOBAIN) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]EP0445559 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 40; figure - *; | [A]US5367745 (ROLOFF HEINZ-RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 64; figure - *; | [A]DE19858709 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20215123U (LAEMMERER & CO GLASDESIGN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-3 * |