EP1351530 - A mobile communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vikberg, Jari T. Svalsätersvägen 12 153 38 Järna / SE | 02 /
Gjärdman, Jan A. Alängsvägen 1 123 52 Farsta / SE | 03 /
Hallenstal, Magnus Täbyvägen 220 187 50 Täby / SE | 04 /
Furtenback, Ros-Marie Pastellvägen 34 121 36 Johnanneshov / SE | 05 /
Nylander, Tomas Hölbyvägen 5 130 37 Stavsnäs / SE | 06 /
Hänström, Martin Storskiftesvägen 166 145 60 Norsborg / SE | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/41] | 01 /
Vikberg, Jari T. Asbovägen 76 152 52 Södertälje / SE | ||
02 /
Gjärdman, Jan A. Alängsvägen 1 123 52 Farsta / SE | |||
03 /
Hallenstal, Magnus Täbyvägen 220 187 50 Täby / SE | |||
04 /
Furtenback, Ros-Marie Pastellvägen 34 121 36 Johnanneshov / SE | |||
05 /
Nylander, Tomas Hölbyvägen 5 130 37 Stavsnäs / SE | |||
06 /
Hänström, Martin Storskiftesvägen 166 145 60 Norsborg / SE | Representative(s) | Gray, Helen Mary, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Gray, Helen Mary, et al Albihns GmbH Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03015799.4 | 17.11.2000 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1351530 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1351530 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04L12/28 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/105 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationsnetz | [2003/41] | English: | A mobile communication network | [2003/41] | French: | Réseau de communication mobile | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00125076.0 / EP1207708 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | TR | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | CY | 17.11.2005 | IE | 17.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9935800 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO9956486 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |