EP1504752 - Composition for bleaching human hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nöcker, Bernd, Dr. Feldstrasse 13A 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 02 /
Blumenschein, Katrin Im Büschel 2 64753 Brombachtal-Hembach / DE | [2005/06] | Application number, filing date | 03015835.6 | 11.07.2003 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504752 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504752 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/135 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zum Blondieren von menschlichen Haaren | [2005/06] | English: | Composition for bleaching human hair | [2005/06] | French: | Composition pour la décoloration des cheveux humains | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | CZ | 26.10.2005 | EE | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | RO | 26.10.2005 | SI | 26.10.2005 | SK | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | BG | 26.01.2006 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | HU | 27.04.2006 | IE | 11.07.2006 | LU | 11.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
LU | 11.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
RO | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
HU | 27.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05255037 ; | [A]US3651209 (COHEN BERNARD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0609796 (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0937449 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * claims 1-6 *; | [AD]EP1074239 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940113), vol. 018, no. 019, Database accession no. (C - 1152), & JP05255037 A 19931005 (EISAI CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |