EP1383085 - Modifying motion control signals based on input video characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/35] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarez, Roberto Jose 1549 Dominion Avenue 94087 Sunnyvale, CA / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016045.1 | 15.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US20020196018 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: US 196018 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383085 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1383085 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383085 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G06T5/00, H04N5/14 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/254 (EP,US);
H04N5/144 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20008 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20182 (EP,US);
H04N5/21 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/04] | G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Veränderung von Bewegungskontrollsignallen basierend auf Eingenschaften des Eingabevideos | [2004/04] | English: | Modifying motion control signals based on input video characteristics | [2004/04] | French: | Modification de signaux de contrôle de mouvement se basant sur des caractéristiques de vidéo d'entrée | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.01.2014 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2014 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 30.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2003 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | IE | 15.07.2019 | LU | 15.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4240106 (MICHAEL PETER C [GB], et al) [I] 1,2,8,9 * column 7, line 6 - line 32 *; | [IA]US5166788 (LEE MYEONG-HWAN [KR]) [I] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * [A] 3-5,10-12; | [I] - SHINRI INAMORI ET AL, "A METHOD OF NOISE REDUCTION ON IMAGE PROCESSING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19931101), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1109/30.267402, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 801 - 805, XP000423067 [I] 1,8 * section 4.2 Detection of Motion Area * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.267402 | [I] - NAIMPALLY S ET AL, "INTEGRATED DIGITAL IDTV RECEIVER WITH FEATURES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19880801), vol. 34, no. 3, doi:10.1109/30.20135, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 410 - 417, XP000005761 [I] 1,8 * page 414, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.20135 |