Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1383106


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.03.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.04.2005  [2005/16]
22.12.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
22.12.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
09.11.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.08.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  13.10.2004  [2004/42]
20.08.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
05.12.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]