blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1383106

EP1383106 - Electronic pan flute [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünwoldt, Steffen
Köthener Strasse 73
06847 Dessau / DE
[2004/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/04]
Representative(s)Voigt, Wolf-Rüdiger
Patentanwalt, Alter Markt 1-2
06108 Halle / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Voigt, Wolf-Rüdiger
Patentanwalt, Alter Markt 1-2
06108 Halle / DE
Application number, filing date03016272.118.07.2003
[2004/04]
Priority number, dateDE200213337119.07.2002         Original published format: DE 10233371
[2004/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1383106
Date:21.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:G10D7/02, G10H1/32
[2004/04]
CPC:
G10H1/32 (EP); G10H7/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/04]
TitleGerman:Elektronische Panflöte[2004/04]
English:Electronic pan flute[2004/04]
French:Flûte de pan électronique[2004/04]
Examination procedure22.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
16.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/16]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH10254436  ;
 [Y]GB1513121  (MOGLIA L, et al) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 60 - line 85 *;
 [DY]DE3911836  (ZIEGLER ARWED [DE]) [DY] 1-7,9 * page 3, line 23 - page 3, line 64 *;
 [Y]EP0393703  (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * * column 8, line 36 - column 8, line 20 * * column 12, line 6 - column 12, line 20 *;
 [Y]US6002080  (TANAKA SO [JP]) [Y] 2,4 * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 28 *;
 [Y]US6342662  (CHANG YIN-YAO [TW]) [Y] 9* figures 1,3-6 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10254436 A 19980925 (YAMATAKE:KK) [Y] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.