EP1398337 - Adhesion promoting additive from an unsaturated, amorphous polyester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glöckner, Patrick, Dr. Jahnstrasse 40 40885 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
Cerri, Alessandro, Dr. Im Nott 3 48301 Nottuln / DE | 03 /
Andrejewski, Werner Bismarckstrasse 105 46284 Dorsten / DE | 04 /
Franzmann, Giselher, Dr. Markerbenhöhe 22 58453 Witten / DE | 05 /
Denkinger, Peter, Dr. Grauten Ihl 7 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2004/12] | Application number, filing date | 03016282.0 | 18.07.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | DE20021042265 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10242265 | [2004/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398337 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398337 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/553, C09D201/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
C08G63/553 (EP,US);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | C08G63/553 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/12] | Title | German: | Haftungsverbessernder Zusatz aus einem ungesättigten, amorphen Polyester | [2004/12] | English: | Adhesion promoting additive from an unsaturated, amorphous polyester | [2004/12] | French: | Additif améliorant l'adhérence à partir d'un polyester insaturé amorphe | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP54143494 [ ] (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD., JAPAN); | [XD]DE953117 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [XD] 1-23 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 35 *; | [XD]DE2245110 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [XD] 1-23 * page 5, paragraph 3; examples I-IV; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO8907622 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-23* page 12, line 18 - page 15, line 3 *; | [XD]EP0934988 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [XD] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] *; | [E]WO03080703 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [E] 1-23 * claims 1-23 *; | [X] - FUJITA, TAKETOSHI ET AL, "Unsaturated polyester resin compositions", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1980:147785, URL: STN, XP002239826 [X] 1-23 * abstract * | [X] - NICNAS, "Adhesion Resin BL 215 C", NATIONAL INDUSTRIAL CHEMICALS NOTIFICATION AND ASSESSMENT SCHEME FULL PUBLIC REPORT, XX, XX, (19950510), vol. NA, no. 212, pages 1 - 10, XP002239825 [X] 1-23 * page 2, paragraph 2 * |