EP1388411 - Method and device for producing a three-dimensional object by sintering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems Robert-Stirling-Ring 1 82152 Krailling / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems Robert-Stirling-Ring 1 82152 Krailling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Peter Buchenstrasse 24 82152 Krailling/München / DE | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Hofer, Dorothea, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016444.6 | 21.07.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | DE2002136697 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236697 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388411 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388411 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B29C35/00, // B29C67/04 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B29C35/002 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/295 (EP);
B29C64/393 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/45] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines dreidimensionalen Objekts mittels Sintern | [2004/07] | English: | Method and device for producing a three-dimensional object by sintering | [2004/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production d'un objet tridimensionnel par frittage | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0388095 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-20* column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9629192 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * claims 1,9,10 *; | [DA]US5908569 (WILKENING CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [DA] 1-20 * column 2, line 41 - line 54; figure 1 * * column 3, line 7 - line 24; figure 3 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 33 *; | [DA]US6153142 (CHARI ARVIND [US], et al) [DA] 1-20 * column 9, line 18 - column 10, line 6 * |