EP1386812 - Spring brake cylinder for vehicle brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuderer, Erich Waldstr. 7a 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 02 /
Wolfsteiner, Peter Dr. Winzererstr. 136 80797 München / DE | 03 /
Kerscher, Albert Frühlingstr. 39 85386 Eching / DE | [2004/06] | Application number, filing date | 03016546.8 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | DE2002134196 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234196 | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386812 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386812 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/08 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B60T17/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | Federspeicherzylinder Für Fahrzeugbremsen | [2004/06] | English: | Spring brake cylinder for vehicle brakes | [2004/06] | French: | Cylindre de frein à ressort pour véhicules routiers | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0457030 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 8, line 13; figures 1A,1B *; | [AD]DE10020350 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [AD] 1* column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 39; figure 1 * |