EP1388899 - Oxide superconducting wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome, Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muroga, Takemi, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Yutaka, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 03 /
Araki, Takeshi, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 04 /
Hirabayashi, Izumi, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 05 /
Izumi, Teruo, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 06 /
Shiohara, Yuh, Superconductivity Res. Lab. Int. Supercon.Tec. Center The Juridical Foundation 1-10-13 Shinonome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 07 /
Ijima, Yasuhiro Fujikura Ltd., 5-1, Kiba, 1-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016696.1 | 04.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | JP20020229209 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002229209 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388899 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1388899 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/14, H01L39/24 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
H10N60/0632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oxidsupraleiterdraht | [2004/07] | English: | Oxide superconducting wire | [2004/07] | French: | Fil en oxyde supraconducteur | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1195819 (NEXANS [FR]); | [XY]US2002076567 (HONJO TETSUJI [JP], et al); | [PX]WO03044836 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); |