EP1403440 - Airtight connection between wall and ceiling or wall and wall, for example in a loft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber, Josef Hauptstrasse 21 93199 Zell / DE | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Wasmeier, Alfons, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Wasmeier, Alfons, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016744.9 | 23.07.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE2002144559 | 25.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10244559 | DE2003111506 | 15.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10311506 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403440 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/66 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
E04D12/002 (EP);
E04B9/18 (EP);
E04B9/303 (EP);
E04B1/625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Luftdichter Wandabschluss zwischen Wand und Decke bzw. zwischen Wand und Wand, z. B. eines Dachgeschosses | [2004/14] | English: | Airtight connection between wall and ceiling or wall and wall, for example in a loft | [2004/14] | French: | Raccordement hermetique entre mur et plafond ou mur et mur, par exemple dans un grenier | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2006 | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3205628 (PER FRISK KARL) [A] 1-3,5-10,12 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 58; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]CH476179 (BALLY SCHUHFAB AG [CH]) [A] 5,12* column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2702377 (RICHTER REINHOLD) [A] 1-3,6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3632708 (BUSCH JOHNNY [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 1 - line 66; figure 4 * |