EP1391552 - Arrangement of a doctor blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneid, Josef Rutteshalde 6 88267 Vogt / DE | 02 /
Greis, Roland Schützenstrasse 2 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/09] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016855.3 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | DE2002212745U | 20.08.2002 Original published format: DE 20212745 U | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391552 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391552 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21G3/00 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
D21G3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaberanordnung | [2004/09] | English: | Arrangement of a doctor blade | [2004/09] | French: | Arrangement d'un racloir | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 30.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE20014746U (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |