EP1387077 - Fuel injector for an internal combustion engine with hydraulic pin actuation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 20011 Corbetta / IT | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Powertrain S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 20011 Corbetta / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cobianchi, Andrea Via R. Sanzio, 11 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Cernoia, Fabio Via Guicciardini, 2 40069 Zola Predosa / IT | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2004/06] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03016903.1 | 24.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | IT2002BO00497 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: IT BO20020497 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387077 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387077 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M59/46 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
F02M63/0036 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0035 (EP,US);
F02M63/0063 (EP,US);
F02M55/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2004/44] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit hydraulischem Stift | [2004/06] | English: | Fuel injector for an internal combustion engine with hydraulic pin actuation | [2004/06] | French: | Injecteur de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne avec aiguille à actionnement hydraulique | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2010963 (LECKIE W H) [A] 14* page 3, line 10 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]US5664545 (KATO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 45 - column 9, line 40; figures 1,3,5,7-9 *; | [Y]EP0844385 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0851115 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [A] 6,12,13 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0999360 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE10164284 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 4,9,10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * |