EP1500438 - Device for applying a mass on a roll of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolz, Heidi Grellkamp 8 b 22113 Oststeinbek / DE | 02 /
Schmick, Clemens Erich-Kästner-Str. 2 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03016969.2 | 25.07.2003 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500438 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500438 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/08, A24C5/47 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B05C1/083 (EP);
A24C5/472 (EP);
B05C1/0834 (EP);
B05C1/165 (EP);
B05C11/1039 (EP);
B05C9/12 (EP);
B05C9/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Auftragen einer Masse auf eine Materialbahn | [2005/04] | English: | Device for applying a mass on a roll of material | [2005/04] | French: | Appareil pour appliquer une masse sur une nappe de tissus | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | CZ | 13.09.2006 | EE | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | FR | 13.09.2006 | GB | 13.09.2006 | IE | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | RO | 13.09.2006 | SI | 13.09.2006 | SK | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | BG | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | HU | 14.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
FR | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
FR | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2743022 (ACHOURI NABIL [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph 1; figure 3 * [Y] 3-6; | [A]EP0846499 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19733446 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6197113 (ZIMMER JOHANNES [AT]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002106455 (KEITE-TELGENBUSCHER KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 3-6 * paragraph [0034] * |